MA H261 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4042
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4042
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4042
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require background checks and training of security staff employed at bars and clubs serving alcoholic beverages. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to third party training and background checks for violent history for security staff at bars and clubs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4042 |
2013-10-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2013 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H4042 (Replaced by) 2014-06-16 - Reported, in part, by H3636
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H261 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H261.pdf |