MA H2610 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-30 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Public Service Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-30 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Public Service Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the minority preference for police and fire department hirings in cities and towns. Public Service.
Title
Relative to police and fire department hiring lists
Sponsors
Rep. Rady Mom [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-06-20 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-08 | House | Reporting date extended to Sunday June 30, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-10-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/10/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S1321 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2647
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2610 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2610.pdf |