MA H2629 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4244
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to establishing a sales tax exemption on Earth Day for purchases of “Energy Star” products, so-called, and hybrid motor vehicles. Revenue.
Title
To establish a sales tax exemption for earth day
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4244 |
2017-07-12 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 07/18/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-05-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/18/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H1592 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H3316 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H3341 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H2603 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1474 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H4244 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3316 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H3341 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H2603 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1474 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H4244 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2629 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2629.pdf |