MA H2630 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-09-18 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-09-18 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the tax expenditure budget By Mr. Kaufman of Lexington, a petition of Jay R. Kaufman and others for the establishment of a standing commission (including members of the General Court) to review and evaluate all tax expenditures. Revenue.
Title
Relative to the tax expenditure budget
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-18 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2014-04-03 | House | Discharged to the committee on House Rules |
2014-03-06 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2013-04-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/02/2013 from 10:30 AM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Revenue |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H2630 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H2630.pdf |