MA H2650 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4244
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to taxation of certain solar or wind powered energy systems. Revenue.
Title
Clarifying uncertainties in the clean energy market and in the local taxation of clean energy producing property
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4244 |
2017-04-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S1565 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1600 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1645 (Similar To) 2017-05-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3668
H1635 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H2600 (Similar To) 2018-06-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4576
H1570 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1564 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1572 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H2417 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
H4244 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1600 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1645 (Similar To) 2017-05-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3668
H1635 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H2600 (Similar To) 2018-06-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4576
H1570 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1564 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1572 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H2417 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
H4244 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2650 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2650.pdf |