MA H266 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3613
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-08-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3613
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-08-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3613
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to time share resale and transfer service providers. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to time share resale and transfer service providers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-08 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3613 |
2013-06-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2013 from 01:00 PM-03:30 PM in A-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H3613 (Replaced by) 2014-04-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 76 of the Acts of 2014
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H266 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H266.pdf |