MA H2672 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4639
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the commitment of a certain percentage of revenue to the stabilization fund. Revenue.
Title
Relative to the revenue to the stabilization fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-26 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4639 |
2015-04-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/05/2015 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H4639 (Replaced by) 2016-09-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2394 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2045 (Similar To) 2016-05-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4307
H2808 (Similar To) 2016-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1562 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H3074 (Similar To) 2017-01-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading
H2394 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2045 (Similar To) 2016-05-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4307
H2808 (Similar To) 2016-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1562 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H3074 (Similar To) 2017-01-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2672 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2672.pdf |