MA H2689 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4474
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4474
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4474
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bill Title: An Act authorizing the town of Provincetown to apply the local option room occupancy excise to all seasonal rental properties in the town By Representative Peake of Provincetown and Senator Wolf, a joint petition of Sarah K. Peake and Daniel A. Wolf (by vote of the town) that the town of Provincetown be authorized to impose a room occupancy excise tax on vacation rental property in said town. Revenue. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Provincetown to apply the local option room occupancy excise to all seasonal rental properties in the town
Sponsors
Rep. Sarah Peake [D] | Sen. Daniel Wolf [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-18 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4474 |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-05-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday June 30, 2014, pending concurrence |
2013-04-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/02/2013 from 10:30 AM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H4474 (Replaced by) 2014-09-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H2689 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H2689.pdf |