MA H2692 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4459
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-10-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4459
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-10-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4459
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to penalties for the selling of alcoholic beverages to minors. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to the sale of alcoholic beverages to minors
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Frost [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-10-01 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4459 |
2011-05-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/10/2011 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H4459 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H2692 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=14906&generalCourtId=1 |