MA H2693 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4239
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4239
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4239
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the participation of minority and women-owned businesses on public construction projects. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to the fair participation of minority and women-owned businesses on public construction projects
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-02 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4239 |
2019-07-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/26/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H4239 (Replaced by) 2020-02-03 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2693 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2693.pdf |