MA H2729 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5045
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5045
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5045
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Representatives Cataldo of Concord and Gentile of Sudbury, a petition of Simon Cataldo, Carmine Lawrence Gentile and Michael J. Barrett (by vote of the town) that town of Concord be authorized to establish a building permit fee surcharge for affordable housing in said town. Revenue. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Establishing a building permit fee surcharge for affordable housing in the town of Concord
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-12 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5045 |
2024-07-11 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-05-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday April 30, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-07-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/25/2023 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H2037 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H664 (Similar To) 2024-08-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4923
H2730 (Similar To) 2024-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5045
H2038 (Similar To) 2024-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H4200 (Similar To) 2024-02-26 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H5045 (Replaced by) 2024-09-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H664 (Similar To) 2024-08-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4923
H2730 (Similar To) 2024-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5045
H2038 (Similar To) 2024-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H4200 (Similar To) 2024-02-26 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H5045 (Replaced by) 2024-09-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2729 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2729.pdf |