MA H274 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5043
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to remove the prohibition of discrimination against cash buyers. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to retail transactions
Sponsors
Rep. Bradley Jones [R] | Rep. Paul Frost [R] | Rep. Donald Wong [R] | Rep. Randy Hunt [R] |
Rep. Steven Howitt [R] | Rep. Mathew Muratore [R] | Rep. Michael Soter [R] | Rep. Fred Barrows [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-26 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5043 |
2019-07-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S1858 (Similar To) 2020-01-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H2719 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
H2800 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
S901 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1806 (Similar To) 2020-04-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2401 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2416 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H5043 (Replaced by) 2020-10-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2719 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
H2800 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
S901 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1806 (Similar To) 2020-04-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2401 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2416 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H5043 (Replaced by) 2020-10-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H274 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H274.pdf |