MA H2745 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5103
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Mark of Peru, a petition of Paul W. Mark and others that the Executive Office for Administration and Finance conduct a study to determine the annual cost of the use of state and federal social benefits by employees of large employers. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Identifying corporate irresponsibility
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-06 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5103 |
2019-06-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H1638 (Similar To) 2019-08-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1860 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2386 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S307 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H2182 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1548 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied H2215
S1687 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Accompanied H2618
S670 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1224 (Similar To) 2020-06-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2221 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2531
S2223 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
H4006 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5031
S2311 (Similar To) 2019-08-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4061 (Similar To) 2020-03-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 44 of the Acts of 2020
H3795 (Similar To) 2019-09-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4097 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2020
S2388 (Similar To) 2020-01-09 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4157 (Similar To) 2019-10-30 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H5103 (Replaced by) 2020-11-06 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S1860 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2386 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S307 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H2182 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1548 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied H2215
S1687 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Accompanied H2618
S670 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1224 (Similar To) 2020-06-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2221 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2531
S2223 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
H4006 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5031
S2311 (Similar To) 2019-08-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4061 (Similar To) 2020-03-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 44 of the Acts of 2020
H3795 (Similar To) 2019-09-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4097 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2020
S2388 (Similar To) 2020-01-09 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4157 (Similar To) 2019-10-30 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H5103 (Replaced by) 2020-11-06 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2745 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2745.pdf |