MA H2756 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to appropriate a certain sum of money to the Highway Department for the repair and preservation of historic markers. Transportation.
Title
To preserve historic markers
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Smola [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2017-08-10 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2017-07-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/25/2017 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2756 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2756.pdf |