MA H2761 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S401
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to protecting consumers from unsolicited loans. Financial Services.
Title
Protecting consumers from unsolicited loans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2012-05-07 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Ways and Means |
2012-05-07 | House | Accompanied by S401 |
2011-12-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/31/2011 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
S401 (Replaces) 2012-05-07 - Accompanied H2761
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H2761 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=14345&generalCourtId=1 |