MA H2766 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-30 - Accompanied S1869
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-30 - Accompanied S1869
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Ms. Provost of Somerville, a petition of Denise Provost and others for the annual issuance of a proclamation by the Governor setting apart the second week of March as Massachusetts sleep awareness week. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to sleep deprivation avoidance and promotion of good sleeping practices
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-30 | Senate | Accompanied S1869 |
2019-04-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in 437 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H2669 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
H2666 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
H2757 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
S1869 (Similar To) 2019-07-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1915 (Similar To) 2019-07-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1827 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1866 (Similar To) 2019-07-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2277 (Similar To) 2020-01-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H2666 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
H2757 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
S1869 (Similar To) 2019-07-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1915 (Similar To) 2019-07-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1827 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1866 (Similar To) 2019-07-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2277 (Similar To) 2020-01-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2766 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2766.pdf |