MA H2768 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-19 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-19 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to designate October 18 as inflammatory breast cancer awareness day. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Designating Inflammatory Breast Cancer Awareness Day
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-19 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-01-19 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-01-19 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-01-13 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2015-10-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/20/2015 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in 222 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H1416 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1984 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H1848 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4606
H208 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4733 (Similar To) 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 391 of the Acts of 2016
H1984 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H1848 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4606
H208 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4733 (Similar To) 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 391 of the Acts of 2016
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2768 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2768.pdf |