MA H2772 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3665
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-4)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-07-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3665
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-07-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3665
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the storage and dissemination of certain public records in an electronic format. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
To improve public records
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-16 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3665 |
2015-05-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/26/2015 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H3665 (Replaced by) 2015-11-18 - New draft substituted, see H3858
H2773 (Similar To) 2015-09-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1728 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2003 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H2146 (Similar To) 2016-04-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3026 (Similar To) 2016-06-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2773 (Similar To) 2015-09-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1728 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2003 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H2146 (Similar To) 2016-04-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3026 (Similar To) 2016-06-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2772 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2772.pdf |