MA H2779 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 256 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 256 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide that awarding authorities bear the costs and benefits of certain insurance required for projects. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to insurance in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-06 | House | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 256 of the Acts of 2014 |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2014-07-31 | House | Enacted |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2014-07-28 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2014-07-24 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-07-14 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-07-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-07-14 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2014-07-14 | House | Committee recommends ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-05-14 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-03-20 | House | Discharged to the House Committee on Financial Services |
2013-10-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2013 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H2779 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H2779.pdf |