MA H2804 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2094
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2094
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2094
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to reducing outsourcing By Mr. Fernandes of Milford, a petition of John V. Fernandes and others that the State Purchasing Agent give preference to products or services manufactured or produced in the United States. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to reducing outsourcing
Sponsors
Rep. John Fernandes [D] | Rep. Bradley Jones [R] | Rep. Denise Provost [D] | Rep. Kate Hogan [D] |
Rep. Cory Atkins [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2094 |
2014-02-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/26/2014 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S2094 (Replaced by) 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H2804 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H2804.pdf |