MA H2813 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-22 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-22 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish the Massachusetts law revision commission. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
An act establishing the Massachusetts law revision commission
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-22 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2016-06-02 | House | Discharged to the committee on House Rules |
2016-04-21 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2015-10-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/27/2015 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2813 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2813.pdf |