MA H2813 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish voluntary contribution check-off boxes on state tax returns to provide financial assistance to the Massachusetts Commission Against Discrimination. Revenue.
Title
Relative to creating the massachusetts against discrimination fund
Sponsors
Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D] | Rep. Bud Williams [D] | Rep. Russell Holmes [D] | Rep. Vanna Howard [D] |
Rep. Orlando Ramos [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2023-10-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2813 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2813.pdf |