MA H2817 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4405
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to renewable power. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to renewable power
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4405 |
2019-09-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in 437 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
S1993 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S1930 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2007 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S528 (Similar To) 2019-10-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1940 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2001 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S2002 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S2003 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S1945 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4248 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4435
H4405 (Replaced by) 2020-02-10 - Reported, in part, by H2881
S1930 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2007 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S528 (Similar To) 2019-10-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1940 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2001 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S2002 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S2003 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S1945 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4248 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4435
H4405 (Replaced by) 2020-02-10 - Reported, in part, by H2881
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2817 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2817.pdf |