MA H282 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5027
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5027
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5027
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to allowing stores and shops to open on holidays. Community Development and Small Businesses.
Title
To allow certain stores and shops to open on holidays
Sponsors
Rep. Tackey Chan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-22 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5027 |
2021-06-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/23/2021 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Community Development and Small Businesses |
Same As/Similar To
S2083 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - New draft substituted, see S2703
H5027 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5027 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H282 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H282.pdf |