MA H2828 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4358
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-31 - New draft substituted, see H4358
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-31 - New draft substituted, see H4358
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to bail fees. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to bail fees
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Hunt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-31 | House | New draft substituted, see H4358 |
2012-07-31 | House | Read second |
2012-07-31 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-07-31 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting with the amendment pending |
2012-07-31 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2012-07-31 | House | Committee recommends ought to pass with an amendment substituting a bill with the same title, H4358 |
2012-07-27 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Ways and Means |
2012-07-19 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-06-28 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday, July 31, 2012 |
2012-06-28 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-06-06 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-05-30 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday, June 8, 2012 |
2012-05-30 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-04-12 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-04-11 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday, April 27, 2012 |
2012-01-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/07/2012 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H4358 (Replaced by) 2012-08-02 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H2828 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=14512&generalCourtId=1 |