MA H2828 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4102
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the Division of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance to convey a certain parcel of land in the town of Danvers and under the use and control of the Department of State Police. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Authorizing the Division of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance to convey a certain parcel of land in the town of Danvers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-21 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4102 |
2015-05-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/06/2015 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H4102 (Replaced by) 2016-04-07 - Reported, in part, by H3889
H3093 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2416 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H534 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4155
H3091 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Senate concurred
H956 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4198
H4754 (Similar To) 2017-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 356 of the Acts of 2016
H4760 (Similar To) 2016-12-15 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H3093 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2416 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H534 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4155
H3091 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Senate concurred
H956 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4198
H4754 (Similar To) 2017-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 356 of the Acts of 2016
H4760 (Similar To) 2016-12-15 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2828 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2828.pdf |