MA H2839 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4678
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4678
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4678
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to evaluate the effectiveness of English language learner programs. Education.
Title
To reform English language learning education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-02 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4678 |
2017-06-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/27/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S328 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2385
S173 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2473
H3482 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4678
H2012 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4678
H2719 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
S106 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied S137
S2070 (Similar To) 2017-07-20 - Accompanied H3740
H1250 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1262 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
S2125 (Similar To) 2017-07-27 - See H3740
H3740 (Similar To) 2017-11-14 - Reported by H4032
S2134 (Similar To) 2017-07-27 - See H3740
H4678 (Replaced by) 2018-07-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S173 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2473
H3482 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4678
H2012 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4678
H2719 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
S106 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied S137
S2070 (Similar To) 2017-07-20 - Accompanied H3740
H1250 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1262 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
S2125 (Similar To) 2017-07-27 - See H3740
H3740 (Similar To) 2017-11-14 - Reported by H4032
S2134 (Similar To) 2017-07-27 - See H3740
H4678 (Replaced by) 2018-07-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2839 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2839.pdf |