MA H2843 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H2874
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-08 - Accompanied H2874
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-08 - Accompanied H2874
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to universal full-day kindergarten. Education.
Title
Relative to universal full-day kindergarten
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-08 | House | Accompanied H2874 |
2017-06-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H221 (Similar To) 2018-05-21 - Accompanied H2056
H2061 (Similar To) 2018-02-08 - Accompanied H2874
H320 (Similar To) 2018-02-08 - Accompanied H2874
H2013 (Similar To) 2018-02-08 - Accompanied H2874
S221 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2874 (Replaced by) 2018-06-27 - New draft substituted, see H4665
H2061 (Similar To) 2018-02-08 - Accompanied H2874
H320 (Similar To) 2018-02-08 - Accompanied H2874
H2013 (Similar To) 2018-02-08 - Accompanied H2874
S221 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2874 (Replaced by) 2018-06-27 - New draft substituted, see H4665
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2843 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2843.pdf |