MA H285 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to building upgrades and improvements in underutilized buildings located in economically distressed areas. Community Development and Small Businesses.
Title
To help developers revitalize underutilized buildings
Sponsors
Rep. Patricia Duffy [D] | Rep. Natalie Higgins [D] | Rep. Marcos Devers [D] | Rep. Tami Gouveia [D] |
Sen. Jacob Oliveira [D] | Rep. James Hawkins [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Rep. Carol Doherty [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-02-14 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2021-11-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/23/2021 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Community Development and Small Businesses |
Same As/Similar To
S1601 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2971
S1976 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
S1523 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2770
S1833 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
H2167 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2274 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5199
S143 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1976 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
S1523 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2770
S1833 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
H2167 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2274 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5199
S143 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H285 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H285.pdf |