MA H2857 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H2858
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-07-11 - Accompanied H2858
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-07-11 - Accompanied H2858
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to authorizing the Division of Capital Asset Management and Maintainance to modify the lease agreement on certain property owned by the Commonwealth in the town of Tewksbury. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Authorizing the Division of Capital Asset Management and Maintainance to modify the lease agreement on certain property owned by the Commonwealth of Massachusetts in the town of Tewksbury
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-11 | House | Accompanied H2858 |
2013-05-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/15/2013 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H2858 (Replaced by) 2013-09-25 - New draft substituted, see H3663
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H2857 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H2857.pdf |