MA H287 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4632
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4632
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4632
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to establishing an educational mandate task force (including members of the General Court) to review all existing state mandates imposed on public schools and districts in the Commonwealth. Education.
Title
Establishing an educational mandate task force
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4632 |
2017-09-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H2041 (Similar To) 2018-06-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4632
H4632 (Replaced by) 2018-06-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4632 (Replaced by) 2018-06-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H287 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H287.pdf |