MA H2872 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4143
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4143
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4143
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require companies entering into contracts with the Commonwealth to disclosure information of their participation in the historic slave trade. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to the disclosure of participation in the historic slave trade
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-04 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4143 |
2013-11-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/06/2013 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H4143 (Replaced by) 2014-06-04 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H2872 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H2872.pdf |