MA H2873 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1851
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish an employer student loan repayment tax credit. Revenue.
Title
Encouraging employer student loan repayment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2024-03-21 | House | Accompanied by S1851 |
2023-06-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/22/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H2606 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4518
S1916 (Similar To) 2024-06-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4725
S77 (Similar To) 2024-03-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1851 (Replaces) 2024-03-21 - Accompanied H2873
S1916 (Similar To) 2024-06-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4725
S77 (Similar To) 2024-03-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1851 (Replaces) 2024-03-21 - Accompanied H2873
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2873 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2873.pdf |