MA H2879 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4405
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to regulating the location of fossil fuel transmission pipelines. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Regulating the location of pipelines
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4405 |
2019-11-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H2847 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H2350 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H255 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S1963 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2000 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S1965 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S636 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4440
H4405 (Replaced by) 2020-02-10 - Reported, in part, by H2881
H2350 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H255 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S1963 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2000 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S1965 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S636 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4440
H4405 (Replaced by) 2020-02-10 - Reported, in part, by H2881
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2879 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2879.pdf |