MA H2898 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S386
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to child care expenses for candidates while performing work or attending certain campaign events. Election Laws.
Title
Supporting working parents who choose to run for public office
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-07-23 | House | Read second, amended and ordered to a third reading |
2018-05-14 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2018-04-09 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-04-09 | House | Accompanied by S386 |
2017-10-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/12/2017 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
H1488 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1509 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H111 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4792
H2802 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H90 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4792
H4046 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 46 of the Acts of 2018
S386 (Replaces) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied H2898
H1509 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H111 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4792
H2802 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H90 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4792
H4046 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 46 of the Acts of 2018
S386 (Replaces) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied H2898
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2898 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2898.pdf |