MA H2911 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5200
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5200
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5200
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelatives at home. Revenue.
Title
To provide an income tax exemption for certain individuals caring for their elderly relatives
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-08 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5200 |
2021-12-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/12/2022 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H3004 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5245
H2934 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S1845 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S1982 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5248
H2898 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1800 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S425 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4780
H5200 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2934 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S1845 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S1982 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5248
H2898 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1800 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S425 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4780
H5200 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2911 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2911.pdf |