MA H2913 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the Department of Revenue to collect a surcharge for 911 services from the end users of prepaid wireless services at the point of sale on each retail sale. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
To equitably support enhanced 911 service
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-10-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H2598 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Accompanied H2512
H2442 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2465 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2308 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S702 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1671 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
S1725 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Accompanied H2512
S1865 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
S1928 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H2442 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2465 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2308 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S702 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1671 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
S1725 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Accompanied H2512
S1865 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
S1928 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2913 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2913.pdf |