MA H2915 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-11 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-11 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Chatham be authorized to establish a real property transfer fee in said town. Revenue. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Establishing a real property transfer fee in the town of Chatham
Sponsors
Rep. Sarah Peake [D] | Sen. Julian Cyr [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-11 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-05-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday April 30, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-10-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/11/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H1932 (Similar To) 2024-05-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4570
H3971 (Similar To) 2024-06-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 121 of the Acts of 2024
H3968 (Similar To) 2023-11-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4189
H4189 (Similar To) 2024-01-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 6 of the Acts of 2024
H3971 (Similar To) 2024-06-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 121 of the Acts of 2024
H3968 (Similar To) 2023-11-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4189
H4189 (Similar To) 2024-01-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 6 of the Acts of 2024
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2915 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2915.pdf |