MA H2922 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3932
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H3932
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H3932
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to requiring the investigation of gas leak explosions by the Department of Public Utilities. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Requiring investigation gas leak explosions by the Department of Public Utilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-17 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H3932 |
2013-06-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2013 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H3932 (Replaced by) 2014-03-17 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H2922 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H2922.pdf |