MA H2929 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Kocot of Northampton, a petition of Peter V. Kocot and others for an investigation by special commission (including members of the General Court) to evaluate the archaeological, geological, and fossil record resources and artifacts of the Connecticut River Valley. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to conserving archaeological, geological and fossil resources on public lands
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Kocot [D] | Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D] | Rep. John Scibak [D] | Rep. Jose Tosado [D] |
Rep. Aaron Vega [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-02-14 | House | Discharged to the committee on House Rules |
2017-11-22 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2017-04-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/02/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H263 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2656 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S752 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2404
H1707 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S949 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H311 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
S2074 (Similar To) 2017-05-22 - Placed on file
H1907 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H4098 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 1 of the Resolves of 2018
H2656 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S752 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2404
H1707 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S949 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H311 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
S2074 (Similar To) 2017-05-22 - Placed on file
H1907 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H4098 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 1 of the Resolves of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2929 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2929.pdf |