MA H2937 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5043
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to a sales tax exemption for the sale of used books and other items sold by libraries for fundraising purposes. Revenue.
Title
In aid of libraries
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-29 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5043 |
2021-12-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/22/2021 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-12-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/13/2021 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H3727 (Similar To) 2022-08-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 189 of the Acts of 2022
H2859 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H4120 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5219
S1843 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S1854 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5245
S1355 (Similar To) 2022-12-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 336 of the Acts of 2022
S830 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
H5043 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2859 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H4120 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5219
S1843 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S1854 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5245
S1355 (Similar To) 2022-12-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 336 of the Acts of 2022
S830 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
H5043 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2937 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2937.pdf |