MA H2941 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2041
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2041
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2041
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to improving outdoor lighting and increasing dark-sky visibility. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Improving outdoor lighting and increasing dark-sky visibility
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2041 |
2013-07-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2013 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
S2041 (Replaced by) 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H2941 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H2941.pdf |