MA H2967 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 22 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-09-26 - Read and referred to the Senate Committee on Ethics and Rules
Pending: Senate Ethics and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 22 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-09-26 - Read and referred to the Senate Committee on Ethics and Rules
Pending: Senate Ethics and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the placement of any son of Robert Martinello, a firefighter of the city of Chelsea, on the civil service list for fire service. Public Service.
Title
Relative to the order of placement of a certain person on the civil service eligibility list
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-26 | Senate | Read and referred to the Senate Committee on Ethics and Rules |
2011-09-22 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2011-09-15 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2011-09-15 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-09-15 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2011-09-12 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2011-05-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/07/2011 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H2967 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=14289&generalCourtId=1 |