MA H2968 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to employer-provided childcare tax credits. Revenue.
Title
To incentivize employer-provided childcare
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2023-06-01 | Joint | Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-05-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H147 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4389
S284 (Similar To) 2024-02-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2619
S1863 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Accompanied H2864
H199 (Similar To) 2024-09-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4711
H4389 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S284 (Similar To) 2024-02-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2619
S1863 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Accompanied H2864
H199 (Similar To) 2024-09-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4711
H4389 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2968 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2968.pdf |