MA H2971 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3932
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H3932
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H3932
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a framework for consumer electricity rate savings and to make certain other changes in law. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Promoting transparency in electric bills
Sponsors
Rep. George Peterson [R] | Rep. Bruce Ayers [D] | Rep. Stephen DiNatale [D] | Rep. Paul Frost [R] |
Sen. Richard Moore [D] | Rep. Keiko Orrall [R] | Rep. William Pignatelli [D] | Rep. David Vieira [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-17 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H3932 |
2013-12-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2013 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H3932 (Replaced by) 2014-03-17 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H2971 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H2971.pdf |