MA H2997 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4438
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to the Massachusetts tourism fund. Tourism, Arts and Cultural Development.
Title
Relative to the Massachusetts tourism fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-02 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4438 |
2013-09-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2013 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Tourism, Arts and Cultural Development |
Same As/Similar To
H4438 (Replaced by) 2014-09-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H2997 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H2997.pdf |