MA H3010 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5245
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5245
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5245
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a certain sales tax exemption. Revenue.
Title
Regarding a sales tax exemption
Sponsors
Rep. Frank Moran [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-22 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5245 |
2022-01-18 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 01/21/2022 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-12-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/21/2022 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H2859 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S1843 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S1854 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5245
S1797 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S1988 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1798 (Similar To) 2022-07-25 - Accompanied H3044
S1832 (Similar To) 2022-07-25 - Accompanied H3044
H5245 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1843 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S1854 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5245
S1797 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S1988 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1798 (Similar To) 2022-07-25 - Accompanied H3044
S1832 (Similar To) 2022-07-25 - Accompanied H3044
H5245 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3010 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3010.pdf |