MA H3025 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4281
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4281
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4281
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to identifying existing structural or policy-based impediments to delivering a more comprehensive and efficient transportation system for the senior, disabled, and veteran populations. Transportation.
Title
Establishing an taskforce on the transportation of elders, veterans, and those with disabilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-12 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4281 |
2016-02-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/24/2016 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H4281 (Replaced by) 2016-05-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4733 (Similar To) 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 391 of the Acts of 2016
H1416 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1984 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H1848 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4606
H208 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4733 (Similar To) 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 391 of the Acts of 2016
H1416 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1984 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H1848 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4606
H208 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3025 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3025.pdf |