MA H303 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4690
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-21 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-21 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Investment adviser registration
Title
Relative to investment adviser registration.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-21 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | |
2010-07-21 | Rules suspended | |
2010-07-21 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting | |
2010-06-23 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Committee On Steering, Policy and Scheduling | |
2010-06-07 | Discharged from committee and recommitted to the committee on Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure | |
2010-06-07 | Reported on a part of H4690 | |
2010-05-19 | Accompanied a study order, see H4690 | |
2009-01-20 | Senate concurred | |
2009-01-20 | Referred to the committee on Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H4690 (Replaced by) 2010-06-07 - Reported, in part, by H303
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/186/House/H303 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=5999&generalCourtId=2 |