MA H3030 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the definition of fraud in public construction bid laws. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to the definition of fraud in public construction bid laws
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-10 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2023-06-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/27/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S2034 (Similar To) 2024-01-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3030 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3030.pdf |